FL S0106 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Florida Teacher Fair Pay Act"; providing legislative intent that the Florida Education Finance Program be funded at a level that ensures a certain minimum annual starting salary for instructional personnel; specifying a statewide minimum salary for all instructional personnel for the 2020-2021 fiscal year; requiring the Department of Education to annually calculate an adjusted statewide minimum annual starting salary, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructional Personnel Salaries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-08-16SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-08-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1223 (Similar To) 2020-01-17 - Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee
S1400 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012052Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback