FL S0102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Florida Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act"; authorizing a personal representative to have access to specified digital assets of a decedent under certain circumstances; authorizing a guardian to have access to specified digital assets of a ward under certain circumstances; providing the rights of a fiduciary relating to digital assets; providing requirements for compliance for a custodian, a personal representative, a guardian, an agent, a trustee, or another person that is entitled to receive and collect specified digital assets, etc.
Title
Digital Assets
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Dorothy Hukill [R] | Sen. Arthenia Joyner [D] |
Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 4 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/03/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Fiscal Policy; Rules |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0313 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |