FL H0313 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes personal representative to have access to specified digital assets of decedent; authorizes guardian to have access to specified digital assets of ward; authorizes agent to have access to specified digital assets of principal; authorizes trustee to have access to specified digital assets held in trust; provides rights of fiduciary relating to digital assets; provides that specified provisions in terms-of-service agreement are unenforceable or void as against strong public policy of state; provides requirements for compliance for custodian, personal representative, guardian, agent, trustee, or another person that is entitled to receive & collect specified digital assets; provides for damages if demand for trust instrument is not made in good faith by custodian; provides immunity for custodian & its officers, employees, & agents for action performed in good faith & in compliance with act; provides applicability.
Title
Digital Assets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-03-19 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-19 | House | Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-17 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/17/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall --Workshopped |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0102 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |