FL S0102 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Renames the agency the Department of Information Technology. Requires that the department director have a degree from an accredited postsecondary institution in certain fields, be appointed by the Governor, and serve at the pleasure of the Governor. Establishes divisions within the department. Specifies proposals that must be included in the department's annual work plan, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agency for Enterprise Information Technology

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-07 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-05 CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 461
2011-03-31 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/11, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-25 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/30/11, 3:45 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 19
2010-11-29 Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 19
2010-11-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0031 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
14204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
170315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2823055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6685Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66850Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback