FL H0031 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Office of Chief Technology Officer within DFS; requires that Chief Technology Officer be appointed by Governor & Cabinet; requires that office be composed of three divisions; provides duties of such divisions; requires that Chief Technology Officer develop multiyear plan of action for purpose of meeting specified objectives.
Title
Office of Chief Technology Officer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 9 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 9 | |
2010-11-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0102 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/31 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0031/BillText/Filed/HTML |