FL S0094 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 31 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 31 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to require members of a district school board to be elected in a partisan election, etc.
Title
Partisan Election of Members of District School Boards
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 31 (Passed) |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Substituted HJR 31 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Now in Education Pre-K -12 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education Pre-K -12; Rules |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H31 (Same As) 2023-06-21 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State