FL H0031 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendments to State Constitution to require members of district school board to be elected in partisan election.
Title
Partisan Elections for Members of District School Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#66 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#66 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |
2023-04-19 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-19 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 11 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Substituted for SJR 94 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-03-31 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-03-31 | House | Passed; YEAS 79, NAYS 34 |
2023-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-30 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2023-03-08 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-14 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda |
2022-12-23 | House | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2022-12-23 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2022-12-23 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2022-12-23 | House | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2022-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S94 (Same As) 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 31 (Passed)