FL S0092 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Chapter No. 2013-33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Freedom from Unwarranted Surveillance Act"; prohibiting a law enforcement agency from using a drone to gather evidence or other information; authorizing an aggrieved party to initiate a civil action in order to prevent or remedy a violation of the act; prohibiting a law enforcement agency from using in any court of law in this state evidence obtained or collected in violation of the act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Searches and Seizures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#137 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-26 Chapter No. 2013-33
2013-04-22 Approved by Governor
2013-04-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2013-04-18SenateOrdered enrolled
2013-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2013-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-17HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 119
2013-04-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13
2013-04-15HouseReceived
2013-04-15HouseReferred to Calendar
2013-04-11HouseIn Messages
2013-04-10SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2013-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-04SenateRead 2nd time
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/13
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-03-28SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2013-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2013-03-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2013-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2013-03-18SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2013-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/19/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2013-03-14SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2013-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-03-12SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2013-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/12/13, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2013-03-05SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2013-03-05SenateIntroduced
2013-02-06SenateNow in Judiciary
2013-02-06SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2013-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/13, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2013-01-22SenateNow in Community Affairs
2013-01-22SenateRemaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2013-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2013-01-15SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2013-01-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/15/13, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2012-12-06SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2012-12-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0119 (Similar To) 2013-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 92 (Ch. 2013-33)

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/92
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/836310/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/816222/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/123408/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/587418/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/768226/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/733284/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/638734/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/Amendment/841214/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/FloorVotes/3nOQp%2FGTjWTtOonVs7sBpDft%2FmQ%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130410%2FSenateVote%5Fs0092c2002%2EPDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0092/FloorVotes/oVAobno%2Fi2gz%2FmltW91ynNkzcIg%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130417%2FHouseVote%5Fs0092c2137%2EPDF

Bill Comments

feedback