FL S0086 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a contract between a health insurer, prepaid limited health service organization, or health maintenance organization, and a dentist from requiring the dentist to provide services at a fee set by the insurer or organization under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Dentists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#792 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#792 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-64 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (414241, 429117, 487991) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In returning messages |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (414241, 429117, 487991) |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 31 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Received |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-03-20 | House | In Messages |
2014-03-18 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/14, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/10/13, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-09-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 10/08/13, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0031 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
S0710 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
H0869 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Select Committee on PPACA, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
S0710 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
H0869 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Select Committee on PPACA, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108), CS/SB 86 (Ch. 2014-64)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
636 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |