FL S0084 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain licensed facilities to provide to victims of sexual assault information regarding emergency contraception and its availability, if requested, etc.
Title
Sexual Battery
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S44 (Similar To) 2019-08-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1057 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1057 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/84 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/84/BillText/Filed/HTML |