FL S0080 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the circumstances under which a court must assess and award the reasonable costs of enforcement against an agency in a civil action to enforce ch. 119, F.S.; prohibiting the assessment and award of the reasonable costs of enforcement to a complainant who acted with an improper purpose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#191 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24 Chapter No. 2017-21
2017-05-23 Approved by Governor
2017-05-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-04-25SenateOrdered enrolled
2017-04-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 163
2017-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
2017-04-13HouseReceived
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
2017-04-13HouseReferred to Calendar
2017-03-30HouseIn Messages
2017-03-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2017-03-29SenateAmendment(s) adopted (648400)
2017-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-03-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-21SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/17
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-03-16SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-03-14SenateCS/CS by- Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-03-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-03-08SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2017-03-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-03-06SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2017-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/06/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-02-08SenateNow in Community Affairs
2017-02-07SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
2017-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/07/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2016-12-16SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Judiciary
2016-11-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0163 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21)
S0246 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11912Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0080/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/Amendment/281710/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/Amendment/534824/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/Amendment/356260/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/Amendment/648400/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/Vote/SenateVote_s00080c2002.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/80/Vote/HouseVote_s00080e1191.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback