FL H0163 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises circumstances under which court must assess & award costs of enforcement against agency in civil action to enforce ch. 119, F.S.; specifies circumstances under which complainant is not required to provide written notice of public records request; prohibits assessment & award of costs of enforcement to complainant who acts with improper purpose; requires court to assess & award costs against complainant found to act with improper purpose.
Title
Public Records
Sponsors
House Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee | Sen. Daniel Burgess [R] | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21) |
2017-04-19 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 80 |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-24 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-08 | House | Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0080 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-21
S0246 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21)
S0246 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 80 (Ch. 2017-21)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/163 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0163/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/163/BillText/c1/PDF |