FL S0074 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Chapter No. 2024-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Chapter No. 2024-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; removing inconsistencies, redundancies, and unnecessary repetition in the statutes; and improving the clarity of the statutes and facilitating their correct interpretation, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#538 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Chapter No. 2024-2 | |
2024-02-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-02-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-01-18 | House | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-17 | House | Substituted for HB 7029 |
2024-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-11 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/17/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-01-10 | House | In Messages |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/10/24 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2023-12-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 12/13/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7029 (Same As) 2024-01-17 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 74
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 648 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 286 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 0104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 32051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
173 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
296 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
298 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
330 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0933 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 1103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 2042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
571 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
585 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 06292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 8015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
692 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 21031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
933 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |