FL S0072 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the legislative intent relating to the authorization of law enforcement officers to stop motor vehicles and issue citations to persons who are texting while driving; requiring deposit of fines into the Emergency Medical Services Trust Fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of Wireless Communications Devices While Driving

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-09-25SenateWithdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S90 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H121 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H33 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback