FL S0090 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the legislative intent relating to the authorization of law enforcement officers to stop motor vehicles and issue citations to persons who are texting while driving; requiring deposit of fines into the Emergency Medical Services Trust Fund; requiring a law enforcement officer to inform a person who is stopped for texting while driving of the person's right to decline a search of his or her wireless communications device, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of Wireless Communications Devices While Driving

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-23SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateCS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-30SenateNow in Transportation
2017-10-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-24SenateCS by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S72 (Same As) 2017-09-25 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H121 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H33 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback