FL S0070 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Donna Catalano by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; providing an appropriation to compensate Donna Catalano for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence of Donald Gerard Burthe, an employee of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; providing a limitation on the payment of certain fees, costs, and other expenses, etc.
Title
Relief of Donna Catalano by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#817 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 2 473 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6509 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 70