FL S0064 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an honorary designation of a certain transportation facility in a specified county, etc.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations/Officer Lance Christian Whitaker Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#148 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Chapter No. 2019-170 | |
2019-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-17 | House | Immediately certified |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Substituted for HB 43 |
2019-04-11 | House | Received |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | In Messages |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/19 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/14/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/06/19, 4:15 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/19/19, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H43 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 64 (Ch. 2019-170)