FL S0060 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to provide that neither house of the Legislature may vote on a bill that would affect access to abortion services unless at least half of the members of that house are women, etc.
Title
Bill Affecting Access to Abortion Services/Passage of Bills
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H95 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/60 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/60/BillText/Filed/HTML |