FL S0046 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Ramiro Companioni, Jr., by the City of Tampa; providing for an appropriation to compensate Mr. Companioni for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the City of Tampa, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Ramiro Companioni, Jr., by the City of Tampa

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6545
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted CS/HB 6545
2018-03-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (536242)
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-14SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-31SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-31SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-30SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-25SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-25SenateRecommendation: Unfavorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-08-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6545 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-193

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback