FL H6545 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to compensate Ramiro Companioni, Jr., for injuries sustained as result of negligence of City of Tampa; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs; extinguishes certain government lien interests.
Title
Relief/Ramiro Companioni, Jr./City of Tampa
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#749 (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#749 (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Chapter No. 2018-193 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 46 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 2 |
2018-03-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (604971) |
2018-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-01 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-25 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S46 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6545
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
204 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |