FL S0042 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6525 (Ch. 2019-189)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6525 (Ch. 2019-189)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Jorge L. Dominguez, Chelsea Beatrice Dominguez, Brittney Delores Dominguez, and Tori Alexis Dominguez by Hillsborough County; providing for an appropriation to compensate them for the wrongful death of Darcia Lynn Dominguez, which occurred as the result of the negligence of Hillsborough County and one of its employees, etc.
Title
Relief of Dominguez by Hillsborough County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6525 (Ch. 2019-189) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 6525 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Report Submitted by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6525 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-189