FL S0032 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to adopt rules for mangrove replanting and restoration; providing requirements for the rules; requiring the department, in consultation with the Division of Insurance Agent and Agency Services, to conduct a statewide feasibility study regarding the use of mangroves and other nature-based solutions in order to improve a local government's community rating for flood insurance purposes, etc.
Title
Mangrove Replanting and Restoration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/17/24, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-12-06 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 12/06/23, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1581 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules