FL S0026 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Providing for the relief of the Estate of Eric Scott Tenner by Miami-Dade County; providing for an appropriation to compensate his estate for damages sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the Miami-Dade County Board of Commissioners, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relief of Eric Scott Tenner by Miami-Dade County



2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-18SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-18SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-12SenateRecommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules

Same As/Similar To

H6543 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments