FL S0024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Altavious Carter by the Palm Beach County School Board; providing an appropriation to compensate Mr. Carter for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of a bus driver of the Palm Beach County School District, etc.
Title
Relief of Altavious Carter by the Palm Beach County School Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/07/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6549 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-230
S304 (Similar To) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)
S304 (Similar To) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)