FL H6549 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for an appropriation to compensate Altavious Carter for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of a bus driver of the Palm Beach County School District; providing for an appropriation and annuity to compensate Dustin Reinhardt for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of employees of the Palm Beach County School District; providing a limitation on the payment of compensation, fees, and costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Altavious Carter and Dustin Reinhardt/Palm Beach County School Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#427 (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#293 (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28 Chapter No. 2017-230
2017-06-02 Approved by Governor
2017-05-18 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2017-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 2
2017-05-03HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (692978) 1097
2017-05-01HouseIn returning messages
2017-05-01SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 31 NAYS 5
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-28SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-28SenateAmendment(s) adopted (692978)
2017-04-28SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-28SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 304
2017-04-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-28SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2017-04-26SenateReceived
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-26SenateIn Messages
2017-04-26HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 3
2017-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (970685)
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-30HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
2017-03-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/30/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-23HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-03-22HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-21HouseCS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2017-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-03-10HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S24 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)
S304 (Similar To) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)
H6531 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/Amendment/110329/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/Amendment/970685/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/Vote/HouseVote_h06549e1293.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/Vote/SenateVote_h06549e1013.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6549/Vote/HouseVote_h06549e1427.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback