FL S0014 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Douglas and Gail Quinn by the Department of Business and Professional Regulation; providing for an appropriation to compensate Mr. and Mrs. Quinn for injuries and damages they sustained by a contractor licensed by the Department of Business and Professional Regulation and by the Construction Industry Licensing Board's actions in administering the Florida Homeowners' Construction Recovery Fund; providing a limitation on the payment of compensation and attorney fees, etc.
Title
Relief of Douglas and Gail Quinn by the Department of Business and Professional Regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/14 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/14/BillText/Filed/HTML |