FL S0012 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-234

Summary

Compensates Stephen Hall for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the Department of Transportation. Provides a limitation of the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION: $388,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Stephen Hall/DOT [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-234
2010-04-30 Approved by Governor -SJ 01582
2010-04-28 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -SJ 00991
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991
2010-04-28 Read 3rd time -HJ 01228; Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 3 -HJ 01229
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01174; Substituted for HB 9 -HJ 01174
2010-04-26 Received -HJ 01093; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01093
2010-04-16 In Messages
2010-04-15 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00591; Read 3rd time -SJ 00591; Passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 5 -SJ 00591
2010-04-07 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00524
2010-04-06 Favorable by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 309-C
2010-03-26 Recommendation: Favorable by The Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 00349; Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00349
2010-03-23 References corrected to The Special Master on Claim Bills; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00322
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 00015
2009-12-09 Referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills
2009-07-31 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0009 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 12; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 12 (Ch. 2010-234) -HJ 01174

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback