FL H0009 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 12; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 12 (Ch. 2010-234) -HJ 01174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides appropriation to compensate Stephen Hall for injuries sustained as result of negligence of employee of DOT; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION: $388,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Stephen Hall/DOT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 12; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 12 (Ch. 2010-234) -HJ 01174
2010-03-26 Favorable by- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00407; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00407
2010-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-22 Favorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 00378; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00378
2010-03-18 On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, Reed Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00010
2009-10-01 Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
2009-06-15 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0012 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-234

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback