FL S0008 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the application requirements for an operating license to conduct pari-mutuel wagering for a pari-mutuel facility; prohibiting greyhound permitholders from conducting live racing; specifying that certain permitholders that do not conduct live racing or games retain their permit and remain pari-mutuel facilities; specifying that, if such permitholder has been issued a slot machine license, the permitholder's facility remains an eligible facility, continues to be eligible for a slot machine license, is exempt from certain provisions of ch. 551, F.S., is eligible to be a guest track, and, if the permitholder is a harness horse racing permitholder, is eligible to be a host track for intertrack wagering and simulcasting and remains eligible for a cardroom license, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#469 (Y: 73 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25 Approved by Governor
2021-05-20 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-05-19SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-05-19HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-05-19HouseCS passed; YEAS 73, NAYS 43
2021-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HouseAmendment 365871 Failed
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HouseAmendment 663291 withdrawn
2021-05-19HouseAmendment 358093 withdrawn
2021-05-19HouseAmendment 365871 filed
2021-05-19HouseAmendment 358093 filed
2021-05-19HouseAmendment 663291 filed
2021-05-18House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-05-18HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (5/19/2021)
2021-05-18HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-05-18HouseIn Messages
2021-05-18SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2021-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-18SenateAmendment(s) adopted (234656, 508950, 885116)
2021-05-18SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-17SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-05-17SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/18/21
2021-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-05-17SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-05-17SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2021-05-17SenateIntroduced
2021-05-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 05/17/21, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-05-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Approved by Governor
H7 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
H1 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3800651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55024055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5505251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849251Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/406258/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/979034/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/274892/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/606424/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/938248/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/835556/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/431978/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/508950/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/234656/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8/Amendment/885116/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/Analyses/2021s00008A.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/Analyses/2021s00008A.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/Vote/2021-05-17%200200PM~S00008A%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/Vote/SenateVote_s00008Ac1006.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/8A/Vote/HouseVote_s00008Ae1469.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback