FL H0007 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to pari-mutuel wagering, slot machines, & gambling; prohibits greyhound racing or dogracing; revises specified criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House Select Committee on Gaming (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Select Subcommittee on Authorized Gaming Activity (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-05-19HouseLaid on Table, Refer to CS/SB 8-A
2021-05-18HouseBill released to Rules Committee
2021-05-18HouseCS Filed
2021-05-18HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-05-18HouseReported out of Select Committee on Gaming
2021-05-18HouseFavorable with CS by Select Committee on Gaming
2021-05-17HouseAdded to Select Committee on Gaming agenda
2021-05-17House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-05-17House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-05-17HouseNow in Select Committee on Gaming
2021-05-17HouseReferred to Select Committee on Gaming
2021-05-17HouseCS Filed
2021-05-17HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-05-17HouseReported out of Select Subcommittee on Authorized Gaming Activity
2021-05-17HouseFavorable with CS by Select Subcommittee on Authorized Gaming Activity
2021-05-17HouseAdded to Select Subcommittee on Authorized Gaming Activity agenda
2021-05-14HouseNow in Select Subcommittee on Authorized Gaming Activity
2021-05-14HouseReferred to Select Committee on Gaming
2021-05-14HouseReferred to Select Subcommittee on Authorized Gaming Activity
2021-05-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1 (Related) 2021-05-19 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
S8 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Approved by Governor
S2 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Approved by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3800651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55024055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5505251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849251Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7/Amendment/072523/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7/Amendment/096221/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7/Amendment/206121/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7/Amendment/780065/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7/Amendment/784059/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/Analyses/h0007A.AGA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/Analyses/h0007Aa.AGA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/Analyses/h0007Ab.SCG.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/Analyses/h0007Ac.SCG.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021A/7A/Analyses/h0007Az.SCG.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60726&IsPCB=0&BillId=73018
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60758&IsPCB=0&BillId=73018

Bill Comments 750

feedback