FL S0006 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of J.D.S. by the Agency for Persons with Disabilities; providing an appropriation from the General Revenue Fund to compensate J.D.S. for injuries and damages sustained as a result of negligence by the Agency for Persons with Disabilities, as successor agency of the Department of Children and Family Services; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of J.D.S. by the Agency for Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3511 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/6 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0006/BillText/Filed/HTML |