FL H9281 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Natural Gas Line Construction - Malone.
Title
Natural Gas Line Construction - Malone
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-09 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-09 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/9281 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/9281/BillText/Filed/PDF |