FL H9243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Parrish Fire District Station.
Title
Parrish Fire District Station
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9243 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/9243/BillText/Filed/PDF |