FL H9109 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1862 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1862 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Florida Gulf Coast University Men's Basketball Team.
Title
Florida Gulf Coast University Men's Basketball Team
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Caldwell [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Matt Hudson [R] | Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Roberson [R] | Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] | Rep. Carlos Trujillo [R] | Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1862 (Adopted) |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2013-04-15 | House | Introduced |
2013-04-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1862 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9109 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/9109 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/9109/BillText/Filed/PDF |