FL H9045 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Jack and Jill of America, Inc., on occasion of their visit to Florida Capitol on March 26, 2015.
Title
Jack and Jill of America, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/9045 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/9045/BillText/Filed/PDF |