FL H8011 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes February 12-16, 2018, as Jewish American Heritage Week in Florida.
Title
Jewish American Heritage Week
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] | Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Bill Hager [R] |
Rep. Richard Stark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2018-01-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - Adopted
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/8011 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/8011/BillText/Filed/PDF |