FL H8011 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Adopted by Publication
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes March 30, 2017, as "Dominican-American Heritage Day" in Florida.
Title
Dominican-American Heritage Day
Sponsors
Rep. Daisy Baez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Adopted by Publication |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/8011 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/8011/BillText/Filed/PDF |