FL H8003 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifies proposed amendment to U.S. Constitution relating to equal rights for men & women.
Title
Equal Rights for Men and Women
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00153 | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council | |
2010-01-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1192 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary