FL S1192 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifies the proposed amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to equal rights for men and women.
Title
Equal Rights for Men and Women [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Aronberg [D] | Sen. Nancy Detert [R] | Sen. Dan Gelber [D] | Sen. Dennis Jones [R] |
Sen. Arthenia Joyner [D] | Sen. Charlie Justice [D] | Sen. Nan Rich [D] | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary; Rules -SJ 00085 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Judiciary; Rules | |
2010-01-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8003 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)