FL H7239 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for statements of reference held by Board of Pharmacy within DOH concerning practitioner seeking controlled substance dispensing registration; provides exception to exemption; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Statement of Reference/Board of Pharmacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died on Calendar | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00972 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00815 | |
2010-04-17 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 00761 | |
2010-04-16 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00726 |
Same As/Similar To
H0225 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2272 (Ch. 2010-211)