FL H7141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to prohibition on certain acts relating to adulterated syrup unless specified information is provided.
Title
Adulterated Syrup
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-19 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, 404 HOB --Discussed | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB --Not Considered | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/30/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB --Not Considered | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Judiciary Committee -HJ 311 | |
2011-03-23 | Introduced -HJ 277 | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7141 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7141/BillText/Filed/HTML |