FL H7111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1218
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1218
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes revision of Article V of State Constitution, relating to judiciary, consisting of amendments to ss. 2, 11, & 12, Art. V, of State Constitution; revises provisions relating to repeal of court rules; limits readoption of repealed court rule; provides for Senate confirmation of Supreme Court justices; requires JQC to make all of its files available to House Speaker; provides for confidentiality of records provided to House of Representatives until impeachment is initiated; makes other conforming & modernizing changes.
Title
Judiciary
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Aubuchon [R] | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Eric Eisnaugle [R] | House Judiciary Committee |
Rep. Larry Metz [R] | Rep. Stephen Precourt [R] | Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#481 (Y: 80 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#84 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#211 (Y: 79 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#210 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#209 (Y: 38 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#208 (Y: 39 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#188 (Y: 39 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#84 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#211 (Y: 79 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#210 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#209 (Y: 38 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#208 (Y: 39 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#188 (Y: 39 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1218 | |
2011-05-05 | Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (611389) -SJ 1003 | |
2011-05-03 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (611389) -HJ 1101 | |
2011-05-02 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-02 | Read 3rd time -SJ 703 | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 579 | |
2011-04-20 | In Messages | |
2011-04-15 | Read 3rd time -HJ 648 | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 623 | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/11 | |
2011-04-08 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-07 | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 601 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-22 | Filed |