FL H7103 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain confidential information obtained under ch. 985, F.S., relating to juvenile justice, is exempt from public records requirements; revises applicability of public records requirements with respect to arrest records of certain juvenile offenders; provides for future review & repeal of such applicability provisions; provides exemption from public records requirements for juvenile information compiled by Criminal Justice Information Program from intrastate sources; provides exceptions; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; provides for release by FDLE of criminal history information of juvenile which has been deemed confidential & exempt; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Juvenile Criminal History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-04-02 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1082 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
S1316 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1316 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
496 | 4101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7103 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7103/BillText/Filed/PDF |