FL S1082 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions requiring the court to order the delivery of a child to a jail or other facility intended or used to detain adults; revising the circumstances under which the state attorney is authorized to file an information when a child of a certain age range commits or attempts to commit specified crimes; revising the criteria in determining whether to impose juvenile or adult sanctions, etc.
Title
Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2015-03-24 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0783 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S0498 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
H7103 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
S0498 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
H7103 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |