FL H7103 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1060
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1060
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reorganizes exemptions from public record & open meeting requirements for Florida Opportunity Fund & Institute for the Commercialization of Public Research; removes references to institute & relocates institute's exemptions in new statute; saves exemptions from repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act & removes scheduled repeal thereof; provides exemptions from public record & open meeting requirements for Institute for the Commercialization of Public Research; provides exemption from public record requirements for materials relating to methods of manufacturing, trade secrets, patents, & research by universities or other publically supported organizations, materials supplied by proprietor, information that would identify investors or potential investors, & information that is confidential & exempt under other laws; provides exemption from public meeting requirements for portions of meetings of institute's board of directors at which confidential & exempt information is discussed; provides exemption from public record requirements for transcripts & minutes of exempt portions of meetings of institute's board of directors.
Title
OGSR/Florida Opportunity Fund and Institute for the Commercialization of Public Research
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#809 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#809 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1060 | |
2012-02-29 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 716 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 715 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 695 | |
2012-02-24 | Received -SJ 683 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 746 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 745 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 699 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 671 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 571 | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced -HJ 542 | |
2012-02-08 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 9626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9627 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |