FL H7101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7034 (Ch. 2015-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7034 (Ch. 2015-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers, renumbers, & amends provisions relating to exemption from public records requirements for certain information regarding persons who are victims of stalking or aggravated stalking; removes scheduled repeal.
Title
OGSR/Victims of Stalking or Aggravated Stalking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7034 (Ch. 2015-78) |
2015-04-21 | House | Substituted CS/SB 7034 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7034 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-78
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
741 | 4651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7101 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7101/BillText/Filed/PDF |