FL S7034 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Transferring, renumbering, and amending provisions relating to an exemption from public records requirements for certain information of persons who are victims of stalking or aggravated stalking; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Stalking Victims Identifying Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#232 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-78
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 7101
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-08HouseIn Messages
2015-04-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-04-02SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-26SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-19SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-18SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2015-03-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-17SenateIntroduced
2015-03-17SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-06SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-03-04SenateFiled
2015-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/03/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-02-26SenateSubmitted for consideration by Ethics and Elections

Same As/Similar To

H7101 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7034 (Ch. 2015-78)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7414651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
970585Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback