FL H7089 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state or political subdivisions from limiting or restricting enforcement of federal immigration laws; provides that state or its political subdivisions may not be prohibited from maintaining or exchanging information regarding immigration status; authorizes law enforcement officer to determine immigration status; requires implementation consistent with federal law; prohibits using race, color, or national origin in enforcement; requires every employer to use federal E-Verify system; prohibits knowingly employing unauthorized alien, etc.
Title
Enforcement of Immigration Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-19 | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 674 | |
2011-04-18 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-14 | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 7 -HJ 674 | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-08 | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 610 | |
2011-03-16 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
287 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
901 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |