FL H7081 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal under Open Government Sunset Review Act of exemption from public records requirements for information that identifies certain donors or prospective donors to direct-support organization for Statewide Public Guardianship Office; removes superfluous & duplicative language.
Title
OGSR/Statewide Public Guardianship Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#334 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#334 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1164 | |
2011-04-29 | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 593 | |
2011-04-28 | In Messages | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 845 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11 | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 260 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/17/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |