FL H7079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Board of Nursing to establish registration & biennial renewal fees for advanced practice registered nurses to engage in autonomous practice.
Title
Registration Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#175 (Y: 87 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed; YEAS 87 NAYS 25 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-27 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H821 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy